Accounts and annual returns SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB (BROWNFIELD ESTATE)

Charity Number: 278029
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 09 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 13 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 25 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 22 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required