Financial history SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB (BROWNFIELD ESTATE)

Charity Number: 278029
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £3.52k £2.32k £2.82k £2.11k £0
Total expenditure £2.34k £3.32k £3.24k £3.17k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A