Accounts and annual returns THE FRANK PEARSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 278884
Charity reporting is up to date (49 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 26 March 2025 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 26 March 2025 49 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 07 March 2025 396 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 29 January 2025 724 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required