Trustees EAST DOWN OLD SCHOOL

Charity number: 300821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rod Crossman Chair 24 October 2016
THE SWEETINGS CHARITY
Received: On time
Vicky Wilkins Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
Michael Corfield Trustee 31 October 2017
None on record
Wendy Marion Down Trustee 07 March 2016
None on record
Raymond Thomas Trustee 09 November 2015
THE SWEETINGS CHARITY
Received: On time
KEITH COLIN VICTOR PHILLIPS Trustee 24 December 2012
None on record
MRS LIS KEMPF Trustee
None on record