Accounts and annual returns HEACHAM GROUP PRACTICE AMENITY FUND

Charity Number: 1090530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 05 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 21 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window