Financial history HEACHAM GROUP PRACTICE AMENITY FUND

Charity Number: 1090530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £37.73k £77.96k £59.09k £1.78k £4.83k
Total expenditure £42.91k £29.22k £21.84k £23.96k £24.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A