Accounts and annual returns THE NADIA CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 1092954
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2011 23 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2010 20 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 20 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2009 02 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 02 February 2010 On Time