Financial history THE NADIA CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 1092954
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009 05/04/2010 05/04/2011
Total gross income £29.29k £44.43k £30.43k £15.69k £17.50k
Total expenditure £41.54k £28.45k £44.63k £14.17k £42.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A