Financial history EROSH, THE NATIONAL CONSORTIUM FOR SHELTERED HOUSING

Charity number: 1098050
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 07/01/2016
Total gross income £51.04k £40.47k £46.28k £42.59k £58.30k
Total expenditure £64.33k £58.97k £49.49k £41.36k £50.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0