Financial history MAKING THE CHANGE LIMITED

Charity number: 1127567
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £122.72k £119.16k £267.58k £306.91k £45.30k
Total expenditure £3.92k £99.27k £318.02k £300.72k £120.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A