Accounts and annual returns THE LOCOMOTION TRUST

Charity number: 503647
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2008 04 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2007 20 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2006 05 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2005 30 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 Not Required