Financial history THE LOCOMOTION TRUST

Charity number: 503647
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2004 30/06/2005 30/06/2006 30/06/2007 30/06/2008
Total gross income £10.57k £2.55k £5.80k £3.06k £1.27k
Total expenditure £0 £2.42k £9.94k £808 £5.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A