Trustees BURTON JOYCE & DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1157213

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan William Comerie | Chair | 09 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Gill | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim David Grant Hoskins | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Vera Kinsey Treasurer | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Yates Secretary | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gwendoline Lilian McCormick | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Bass Social Sec | Trustee | 13 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Christine Shepherd | Trustee | 13 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Moore | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Williams | Trustee | 09 August 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.