Accounts and annual returns BURY HEBREW CONGREGATION

Charity number: 1165261
Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 February 2024 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 01 August 2024 275 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 February 2024 479 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 August 2024 640 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2022 368 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 February 2023 465 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 May 2021 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 May 2021 194 days late Download Open in new window