Trustees BURY HEBREW CONGREGATION
Charity number: 1165261

Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN MYER FRICS,JP | Chair | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Howard Levy | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
MAURICE COWAN | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
AUBREY TAYLOR | Trustee | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JOSEPH | Trustee | 07 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
STUART KAY | Trustee | 10 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN JOSEPH | Trustee | 02 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Mordechai Shayovitz | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
HARVEY KAYE | Trustee | 01 June 2002 |
|
|
||||
ALAN PADWELL | Trustee | 01 June 2000 |
|
|
||||
ANITA ISAACSON | Trustee | 01 June 2000 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.