Trustees FRIENDS OF SACRED HEART BUSHEY
Charity number: 1173874

Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Griffin | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Andrews | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jade Reid | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Collette Maria McDonagh | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Cooper | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Walsh | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Bartosiewicz | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Blackburn | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.