Financial history Newton on Ouse Community Association

Charity number: 523392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £15.85k £19.50k £8.58k £19.00k £22.99k
Total expenditure £9.52k £15.15k £8.31k £15.08k £15.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A £3.00k