Accounts and annual returns HILLEL FOUNDATION (WEST RIDING)

Charity Number: 529237
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2009 17 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 17 June 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2008 22 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 22 June 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2007 16 July 2008 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 07 July 2008 7 days late
Annual return 31 August 2006 11 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 11 May 2007 On Time