Financial history HILLEL FOUNDATION (WEST RIDING)

Charity number: 529237
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009
Total gross income £83.61k £119.39k £137.78k £130.55k £84.57k
Total expenditure £114.59k £115.19k £117.12k £135.10k £120.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A