Financial history AYLESBURY CONCERT BAND

Charity Number: 1062069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.34k £12.79k £8.56k £7.79k £9.85k
Total expenditure £11.10k £1.54k £8.50k £14.56k £9.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A