Governing document AYLESBURY CONCERT BAND
Charity number: 1062069

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED 23 MAY 2007, 13 MAY 2009 AND 26 MAY 2010. as amended on 02 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS, AND BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN THE PLAYING OF WIND INSTRUMENTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN PRACTICE THE COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.