Trustees AYLESBURY CONCERT BAND

Charity Number: 1062069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Jane Swindles Chair 17 May 2017
None on record
Catherine Dawson Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Karen Lynda Jarvis Trustee 02 June 2021
None on record
Adrian Ivermee Trustee 16 May 2018
None on record
ALISON LOVATT Trustee 16 May 2018
None on record
DAVID PAYNE Trustee 22 July 2013
None on record