Governing document COMMUNITY ACTION SOUTH EAST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE COUNTY OF KENT AND THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND BUT ALSO ELSEWHERE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, AND TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WORKING BETWEEN SECTORS AND RELEVANT BODIES.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF KENT AND THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.