Trustees ABERYSTWYTH SILVER BAND
Charity number: 1004037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Charles Shilton | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Hugh Baldwin | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rhodri Emyr Lewis | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nia Peris | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather Phillips | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Jan Foy | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.