Governing document THORNBERRY ANIMAL SANCTUARY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 05/06/2007 AS AMENDED ON 02/10/2007 AS AMENDED ON 21/08/2008 AS AMENDED ON 21/04/2009 AS AMENDED ON 21/08/2009 AS AMENDED ON 10/09/2013
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, NEGLECT OR MALTREATMENT BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A HOME OR HOMES AS SANCTUARY FOR SUCH ANIMALS; AND 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE PROPER CARE OF ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.