Governing document LINCOLN CATHEDRAL MUSIC FUND
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 JANUARY 1994 AS AMENDED BY DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 31 OCTOBER 1995 AND 26 FEBRUARY 2002. as amended on 17 Dec 2020 as amended on 31 Dec 2020 as amended on 05 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF LITURGICAL AND OTHER MUSIC, BOTH CHORAL AND INSTRUMENTAL AT LINCOLN CATHEDRAL, IN THE AREA OF NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE.
Area of benefit
LINCOLN, LINCOLNSHIRE AND SOUTH HUMBERSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.