Trustees ADFERIAD RECOVERY LIMITED
Charity number: 1039386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor John Brewster Hunt | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|||||||
Nicholas Don de Figueiredo | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Samina Khan | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|||||||
Vicki Evans | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Bishop John David Edward Davies | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Dr Andrea Lynne Davies | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Karen Jayne Ozzati | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Owen | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dean Pulling | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Howard Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rev Sue Northcott | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
CLIVE EDMUND WOLFENDALE | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|||||||
Simon Paul Green | Trustee | 28 May 2014 |
|
|||||||
Dr DYFRIG MORGAN AP DAFYDD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ROBERT CLEDWYN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.