Governing document BOURNEMOUTH SYMPHONY CHORUS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 SEPTEMBER 1979 AMENDED 3 MAY 1994 AND 19 JULY 1994 as amended on 20 Jul 2004 as amended on 20 Jul 2004 as amended on 20 Jul 2004 as amended on 20 Jul 2004 as amended on 20 Jul 2004 as amended on 20 Jul 2004 as amended on 10 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHORUS IS TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC BY THE PREPERATION OF CHORAL CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.