Trustees LONDON TAMIL CHRISTIAN CONGREGATION
Charity number: 1040952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DILUXION ANNAPPAH JEYAKUMARAN | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
THUSHANI RAJAKUMAR | Trustee | 03 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS CHANDRA NIRMALANANDAN | Trustee | 03 September 2017 |
|
|||||
GAYATHIRI CHRISTINA SURENDRAN | Trustee | 03 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
RAPOONY PACKIYARAJAH | Trustee | 03 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS VIJI SATHIYANATHAN | Trustee | 03 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
NISHANI RAJAKUMAR | Trustee | 08 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUHANTHINI THAMBYRAJAH | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
GLADSTONE JESHURAJAH JEYARAJAH | Trustee | 21 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev JESSIE NESAM NALLAMMAL ANAND | Trustee | 01 February 2008 |
|
|
||||
ORLANDO GNANARATNAM SURENDRAN | Trustee | 01 May 2002 |
|
|
||||
THARMALINGAM DHARMACHANDRAN | Trustee | 01 January 1995 |
|
|
||||
LEELA SELVARAJASINGHAM | Trustee | 01 January 1990 |
|
|
||||
SATKUNARAJAH JOE RAJAKUMAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAJI MUTHUKUMAR | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR CHARLES RAJKUMAR | Trustee |
|
||||||
CORDELIA PREMIKA THARMABALAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.