Trustees TOMMY'S
Charity number: 1060508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jolyon Ray Chambers | Chair | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Vanora Hundley | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rowlinson | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sonji Clarke | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shema Tariq | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|||||
David Logan | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Aedamar Comiskey | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Robert Woodward Stirling | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Smaje | Trustee | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY MARIE TATUM | Trustee | 31 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Anita Rose Charlesworth | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.