Trustees THE WHITE ENSIGN ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Charity number: 206787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Ruth Cairnie | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Philippa Haughey OBE QC | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Theocharis Panayiotou Theochari | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant General Edward Grant Martin Davis CB CBE | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Admiral Sir Philip Andrew Jones GCB DL | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Commodore Robert William Dorey RFA | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Commodore Inga Jane Kennedy CBE QHNS | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Michael Ross Saunders Watson DL | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Admiral Sir George Michael Zambellas GCB DSC DL | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
HELEN DEEBLE CBE | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Captain Lance Henry Lowe Batchelor RNR | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
EDMUND WITOLD BYERS | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sara Elizabeth Murray OBE | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Simon Andrew Black | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|||||
ADMIRAL SIR MARK STANHOPE GCB OBE DL | Trustee | 10 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAPTAIN ADAM PETER GOSLING RNR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.