Trustees HUGUENOT SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Charity number: 214726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katrina Matthews | Chair | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROGER ALAN DINES | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Clive Gwatkin Jenkins MA | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Majorie Keen MA | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charles Littleton | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Elizabeth Watts MA PhD | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian William Stone MA | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Dara Robinson MA MCom | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Hampton | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Green | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vivienne Margaret Larminie FRHistS | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Guyon | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeanne Mann LRAM, BA | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Margaret Julien BA | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
S B de Save | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
GLYNDA DAWN EASTERBROOK | Trustee | 12 August 2011 |
|
|||||
ANNE ELIZABETH NUGENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN FREDERIC HARCOURT WILLIAMS MA FCA | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANTHONY WILSON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.