Trustees THE KEYNSHAM CHARITIES
Charity number: 223155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRYAN ORGAN | Chair | 08 April 2013 |
|
|||||
Brian Simmons | Trustee | 28 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DYSON | Trustee | 07 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Hutchings | Trustee | 03 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARCIA COHEN | Trustee | 12 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH PRESLAND | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIE STIDDARD | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
GORDON POUNTAIN | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES GERRISH | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.