Governing document GARSTANG TOWN TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11 JANUARY 1889, AS VARIED BY SCHEMES DATED 5 JULY 1932, 23 DECEMBER 1962, 27 NOVEMBER 1986 AND 24 AUGUST 1992.
Charitable objects
ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A LIBRARY AND READING ROOM FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF GARSTANG OR FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GARSTANG AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.(2) REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE TOWN HALL.(3) ANNUAL PAYMENT OF ú1 TO CORLESS'S CHARITY FOR THE POOR.
Area of benefit
GARSTANG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.