THE DUKE OF CORNWALL'S BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 269183
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £328.57k £122.46k £111.61k £121.40k £139.67k
Total expenditure £105.45k £131.10k £117.52k £157.42k £157.56k