Trustees THE SOCIETY FOR THE PRESERVATION OF ISLE OF WIGHT CHURCH BELLS
Charity number: 275854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Barry Downer | Chair |
|
|
|||||
TRICIA RILEY SHANNON | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Alan Beaton | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Janice Aileen Hookey | Trustee | 28 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER TAYLOR | Trustee | 28 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Lady Kay Lesley Wells | Trustee | 24 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Downer | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Paul Ruszczyk | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Paul Noyes | Trustee | 28 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.