Governing document NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CLUBS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 28 JUNE 1939 AS AMENDED BY ORDERS OF HER MAJESTY'S PRIVY COUNCIL OF THE 26 MARCH 1964, 5 SEPTEMBER 1969, 11 NOVEMBER 1980, 19 NOVEMBER 1991 20 JULY 1993, 19 APRIL 2000 AND SCHEME OF 20 SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 20 MAY 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF BOYS AND YOUNG MEN AND GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF CLUBS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.