Trustees DARTMOUTH MUSEUM ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 306635
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Raymond Rowley | Chair | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Hazel Morris | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iain McCall | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Mr SPENCER WIGLEY | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Turner | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Nichola Long Kirkwood | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Williams | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor RICHARD W I COOKE | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Elizabeth Harrold PhD BA MA | Trustee | 25 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr RICHARD PORTER PhD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.