Trustees THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF MUSIC
Charity number: 309268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD BLACK OF BRENTWOOD | Chair | 27 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Professor Shirley J Thompson OBE | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Rozario OBE | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paula Walter | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tymon Zgorzelski | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Holgate | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Pearson | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Goulding | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Somerville | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Njoku-Goodwin | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Clarke | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Sir Guy Weston HonRCM | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Kevin Porter | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Baroness Veronica Fleet CBE | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Richards | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Sir George Iacobescu | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Ruth Keattch | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Peter Dart | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ratcliffe | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Douglas Gardner | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor Colin Lawson CBE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.