Trustees ROYAL ACADEMY OF MUSIC
Charity number: 310007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Waring | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ayse Irem Tuna Richardson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexis Alexander Ffrench | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ina De | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Barbara Law | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Margaret Fautless | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Duchess Antonia Wellington OBE | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Luke Lloyd-Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
REHMET KASSIM LAKHA DE MORIXE | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lord Blackwell | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM MICHAEL JEFFERIES DE WINTON | Trustee | 25 October 2016 |
|
|||||
DAMIAN WISNIEWSKI | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY CHARLES PARKER | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dame Jennifer Gita Abramsky | Trustee | 17 October 2013 |
|
|||||
LADY SAINSBURY | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BURGESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THE RT HON LORD JONATHAN SUMPTION QC | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.