Governing document THE LEE EDUCATION CHARITY OF WILLIAM HATCLIFFE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 12 SEP 1907 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30 JUN 1914 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21 SEP 1971 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17 JUN 2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 OCT 2023 AS AMENDED ON 04 MAR 2024
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN OR IN THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM AND WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE GOVERNORS ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.