Governing document INSTITUTE OF HOSPITALITY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 NOVEMBER 1949 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 2 MARCH 1995, 14 MAY 2002, 13 JUNE 2006 AND 16 JANUARY 2007 as amended on 14 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
A. THE PROMOTION OF STANDARDS IN THE PRACTICE OF GOOD CATERING AND ACCOMMODATION MANAGEMENT B. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE PRACTICE, IN PARTICULAR PROMOTING RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.