Trustees KNITTING AND CROCHET GUILD
Charity number: 1113468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abberlaine Dianne Pao Che Chan | Chair | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shakeh Manassian | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Noemi Jane-Fernandez | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Hopkins | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angharad Thomas | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amalia Vittoria Liguori | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Scott | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Desiree Isla Jeans | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Stephen John Foreman | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Peck | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.