Trustees SALTBURN DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)
Charity number: 1109691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGO DAVIDSON-WOOD | Chair | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Barwick | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Strong | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bradbury | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DIANE PATRICIA GOLDBY | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Read | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Bladen | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gaye Batiz | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Mary Maternaghan | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HEDLEY SPIGHT | Trustee | 25 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Howard Leake | Trustee | 31 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.