Trustees POWYSLAND CLUB, CLWB POWYSLAND
Charity number: 1120504
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID WILLIAM HALL | Chair |
|
||||||
Lt Col Glyn Ellis Jones Lt Col | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philip Nanney Williams | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Colin Stratford | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Edwina Evans | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
KRISTINE MOORE | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Oldham | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nia Ann Griffiths | Trustee | 14 May 2016 |
|
|||||
David Peate | Trustee | 09 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Alan Payne | Trustee | 09 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Lloyd Peate | Trustee | 09 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ESTELLE BLEIVAS | Trustee | 29 August 2014 |
|
|||||
RICHARD WILFRID CHURCH | Trustee | 07 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN POOLE | Trustee | 07 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JOHN BRITNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAPHNE ELIZABETH WOODHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ANNE STACEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr DAVID STEPHENSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ROGER LEE BROWN MA FSA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr PETER GEORGE BARTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN LEONARD DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BOB SILVESTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.