Trustees THE ECUMENICAL PARTNERSHIP OF CHRIST THE CORNERSTONE MILTON KEYNES
Charity number: 1122083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Krou Barthelemy Assoua | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Lynn Montgomery | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Patricia Anne Kyd | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Mary Phillips | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Adjei | Trustee | 13 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Cope | Trustee | 18 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Carol Joyce Chapman | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nerys Steeds | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Yardley | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Chapman | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rick Mutwarasibo | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Grace Hunting | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Cathy Hampton | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Victor Iain Porteus | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Francis Higgins | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev George Mwaura | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|||||
REVEREND ERNESTO LOZADA-UZURIAGA | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.