Trustees THE EDEN RIVERS TRUST
Charity number: 1123588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD CHARLES ECROYD | Chair | 11 December 2014 |
|
|||||
Ruari Martin | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Edmund John Unwin | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon McGregor | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Alexandra Lack | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Bennett | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Robert Barrow | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Ann Wade | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|||||
John Norman Quinton | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Cherry Bradney | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Leonard Sander | Trustee | 11 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES JOSCELIN TURNER | Trustee | 12 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.