Trustees METHODIST CHURCH - MANCHESTER & STOCKPORT DISTRICT
Charity number: 1135459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Dr Andrew John Lunn | Chair | 10 September 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||
John Kofi Brobbey | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Katherine Jane Smith | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Ian Peter Kemp | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
John Ream | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Catherine Helen Bird | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Christine Ann Clarkson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev John Barry Palmer | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr BERNARD JAMES TREVES BROWN | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Sarah Jane Parkin | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
JANET ABBOTT | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Garrie Charles Naden | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Robert Balfour | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Ian Rutherford | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Dr Adrian Burdon | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
JULIE ANNE MURDY | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Dr ANTHONY MICHAEL JUDD | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Hazel Cook | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Ruth Peak | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
GRAHAM MICHAEL EDWARDS | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
Andrew William Henry Jeffries | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
David Henry James | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.