Trustees CITIZENS ADVICE CHESHIRE WEST
Charity number: 1128367
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Linda Conway | Chair | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Charles William Leach | Trustee | 20 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas David Briggs | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Sian Alice Allan | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Miller | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Barry | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Boyd Bryan Hope | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beverly Ernestine Spicer | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Jaeger Dodds | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY HOPE-TERRY | Trustee | 30 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Max Herberg Griffiths | Trustee | 30 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.