Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SHERBORNE WITH CASTLETON
Charity number: 1130082
Charity reporting is up to date (129 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Martin Lee | Chair | 17 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Rebecca McDonnell | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Pascoe | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie-Ann Soul | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Mahony | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Patricia Chappell | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Michael Farr | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev James Edie | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steve Drew | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Bradshaw | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN CROSSMAN | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Patrick Max Horsey | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Hawkett | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Paul Halbeard Harris | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Baker | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David George Ferguson | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Susan Bradshaw | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Gordon Buesnel Hamon | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Hugh Richmond Lowry Bonsey | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Graves | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David James Fifield | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Neil Grenyer | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Yvonne Francine Libbey | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Rayner | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN RODD | Trustee | 13 May 2012 |
|
|||||
MR MIKE KEATINGE | Trustee |
|
||||||
PAUL BOYD LEE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.